Trustees MOUNTAIN ASH YMCA

Charity number: 250106
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MAIR LEWIS Chair
None on record
Dennis Payne Trustee 01 May 2017
None on record
GUY WALLACE SMITH Trustee 16 February 2016
None on record
Kevin Wells Trustee 21 January 2015
None on record
Anthony Williams Trustee 20 January 2014
None on record
MR ALAN CHRISTOPHER Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
TRUDY FISHER Trustee 01 August 2011
None on record
ALISON FIELD Trustee
None on record