INSTITUTE OF CAST METALS ENGINEERS

Charity number: 250380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £326.38k £222.77k £222.99k £193.15k £84.81k
Total expenditure £369.35k £381.06k £383.26k £282.88k £223.13k
Income from government contracts £96.17k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £96.17k £0 N/A N/A N/A