Accounts and annual returns ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 251398
Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 361 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required