Financial history ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 251398
Charity reporting is overdue by 360 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £6.03k £7.21k £6.83k £4.72k £812
Total expenditure £6.06k £8.63k £6.63k £4.70k £335
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A