Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS READING WITH OXON BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 251482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £95.59k £70.82k £59.02k £84.60k £49.24k
Total expenditure £53.05k £56.94k £70.08k £49.77k £85.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A