Financial history THE TEULU JAMES PANTYFEDWEN STRATA FLORIDA CHURCHYARD TRUST

Charity number: 251754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £11.30k £22.25k £17.99k £12.03k £10.17k
Total expenditure £12.23k £26.84k £15.71k £12.70k £11.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.00k N/A N/A N/A