Trustees THE TEULU JAMES PANTYFEDWEN STRATA FLORIDA CHURCHYARD TRUST
Charity number: 251754

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MEREDITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Aled Wyn Lewis | Trustee | 13 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angharad Jones | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane l Evans | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Watkin | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR IFAN DAVIES | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEWIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY ELEANOR MYFANWY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.