ROMAN CATHOLIC PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONGREGATION OF THE MOST HOLY REDEEMER

Charity number: 252041
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 July 2021 167 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 22 July 2021 167 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 February 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 11 February 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 09 January 2018 On time Download