Financial history FRANKGIVING LIMITED

Charity number: 252370
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £1.95m £2.47m £1.67m £1.88m £1.84m
Total expenditure £903.98k £1.16m £1.15m £2.21m £1.72m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £500 £523.96k £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.95m £1.95m £1.67m £1.88m £1.84m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £296.86k £302.44k £345.30k £835.31k £381.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds £730.95k £856.02k £807.98k £982.63k £988.51k
Expenditure - Governance £11.33k £6.68k £31.83k £13.97k £40.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution £285.53k £295.76k £313.47k £821.34k £340.85k
Expenditure - Investment management £730.95k £856.02k £807.98k £982.63k £988.51k
Expenditure - Other -£123.82k £0 £0 £395.29k £351.95k