ENVILLE SENIOR CITIZENS COMMITTEE

Charity number: 252412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £5.75k £6.27k £3.40k £3.16k £557
Total expenditure £4.81k £5.66k £4.29k £4.74k £554
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A