WETHERDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 252721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 17 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required