WETHERDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 252721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £16.02k £7.33k £5.57k £7.13k £14.81k
Total expenditure £16.51k £5.68k £13.53k £5.76k £4.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k