THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH BISHOP'S STORTFORD

Charity number: 253376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 May 2019 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required