Accounts and annual returns THE REVEREND JAMES WEBB MILLS FOR THE AUGMENTATION OF THE BENEFICE OF KEDINGTON

Charity number: 253508
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 117 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 01 June 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 18 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 18 January 2022 324 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required