Financial history THE HARLEIAN SOCIETY INCORPORATED 1902

Charity number: 253659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.45k £6.67k £6.97k £6.22k £4.79k
Total expenditure £2.19k £12.13k £2.79k £9.24k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A