ALFRED CAPLIN CHARITY SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 254328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 October 2017 On time Download