ALFRED CAPLIN CHARITY SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 254328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £140.79k £57.11k £105.86k £65.53k £57.97k
Total expenditure £72.44k £109.28k £68.98k £60.90k £27.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A