Trustees EVANGELICAL PRESS AND SERVICES LIMITED

Charity number: 254335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev RICHARD JEREMY BROOKS Chair 17 July 2014
WELCOME HALL EVANGELICAL CHURCH, CATSHILL
Received: On time
ALAN CHRISTOPHER WELLS Trustee 11 February 2021
WELCOME HALL EVANGELICAL CHURCH, CATSHILL
Received: On time
NATIONAL YOUNG LIFE CAMPAIGN TRUST LTD
Received: On time
JEREMY ROBERT WALKER Trustee 02 June 2015
MAIDENBOWER BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
MOSTYN ROBERTS Trustee 24 October 2012
WELWYN EVANGELICAL CHURCH ( FORMERLY BETHEL CHAPEL WELWYN)
Received: On time
Graham Murray Hind Trustee 11 October 2012
None on record
JOHN NORRIS Trustee
EVANGELICAL PRESS MISSIONARY TRUST
Received: On time
BUCKINGHAM CHAPEL, BRISTOL
Received: On time