CHARLOTTE ANTONIA SULIVAN FOR MISSION HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 255176
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £36.83k £35.09k £34.79k £60.83k £65.52k
Total expenditure £31.62k £47.54k £87.99k £78.27k £78.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A