Financial history THE LONDON BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 255420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.37m £1.47m £1.58m £1.21m £1.52m
Total expenditure £1.25m £1.29m £5.69m £974.00k £1.36m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £43.50k £0 £44.65k
Income from government grants N/A £31.79k N/A £141.57k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £152.00k £168.87k £255.88k £502.83k £266.08k
Income - Other trading activities £234.96k £257.02k £246.85k £108.72k £246.37k
Income - Charitable activities £964.62k £1.03m £1.06m £581.59k £992.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.61k £16.90k £16.90k £14.34k £15.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £12.72k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.05m £1.11m £5.48m £798.62k £1.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £200.10k £177.39k £209.37k £175.38k £179.87k
Expenditure - Governance £58.84k £21.02k £49.68k £57.22k £29.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £34.92k £37.73k £43.29k £49.44k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.80k £399 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0