Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF LAURA ELIZABETH STUART

Charity number: 255838
Charity reporting is overdue by 1605 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 509 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 509 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 874 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 874 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1239 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1239 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1605 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1605 days