Financial history CHARITY OF LAURA ELIZABETH STUART

Charity number: 255838
Charity reporting is overdue by 1603 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £0 £0 £206 £213 £219
Total expenditure £0 £0 £206 £213 £219
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A