THE NINEVEH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 256025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £301.38k £298.20k £350.89k £345.35k £314.33k
Total expenditure £458.01k £223.55k £350.63k £592.60k £548.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A