THE CHESHIRE YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 256143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.71k £14.70k £116.03k £17.24k £15.99k
Total expenditure £7.41k £8.06k £9.36k £10.57k £17.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A