THE SOCIETY FOR UNDERWATER TECHNOLOGY LIMITED

Charity number: 256659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £406.58k £339.92k £651.93k £323.27k £392.71k
Total expenditure £765.75k £485.69k £656.83k £408.91k £442.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £5.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £3.00k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £640.00k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £8.70k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £235 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £656.83k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £15.08k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A