Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR UNDERWATER TECHNOLOGY LIMITED
Charity number: 256659
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dr Malayath Aravindakshan Atmanand | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Patten MBE | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Connelly | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terry Griffiths | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Swift | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Morgan | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Johnson | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Frances John | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Edward Luff | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Iain Stafford Knight | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor RALPH FRANK RAYNER | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Richard Andrew Binks | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Kirkley | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Saul | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Robert Alexander MacDonald | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert George Cook | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|||||
David Alan Brookes | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.