TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH TABERNACLE WELSH CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL

Charity number: 256916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required