TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH TABERNACLE WELSH CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL

Charity number: 256916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.31k £15.61k £17.78k £14.16k £11.95k
Total expenditure £8.22k £8.94k £24.08k £11.00k £9.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A