WOMEN'S INSTITUTE WOODMANCOTE

Charity number: 256941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £7.88k £7.21k £4.12k £4.12k £2.27k
Total expenditure £8.01k £7.15k £4.16k £4.12k £1.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A