Financial history DEBNEY COTTAGES

Charity number: 256950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £17.84k £19.32k £22.62k £20.13k £21.71k
Total expenditure £5.66k £5.04k £7.80k £13.43k £35.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A