Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL ILLUMINATION COMMITTEE OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 257185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 20 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required