Financial history NATIONAL ILLUMINATION COMMITTEE OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 257185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022
Total gross income £24.28k £23.97k £23.17k £19.35k £21.77k
Total expenditure £27.43k £22.49k £26.99k £12.55k £10.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A