Accounts and annual returns THORPE ST ANDREW TRUST

Charity number: 257209
Charity reporting is overdue by 80 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 80 days
Annual return 30 March 2022 23 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2021 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2019 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2019 Not Required