MANCHESTER JEWISH COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 257238
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £589.23k £555.41k £539.87k £349.30k £647.71k
Total expenditure £705.17k £607.08k £613.89k £618.71k £527.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £10.21k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.09k £14.63k £10.21k £8.53k £25.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £391.47k £352.93k £354.42k N/A £456.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £31.11k £38.94k N/A £700
Income - Charitable activities £176.46k £127.90k £123.87k N/A £143.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £21.31k £28.84k £22.64k N/A £21.98k
Income - Other £0 £14.63k £0 N/A £25.13k
Income - Legacies £224.91k £0 £109.04k N/A £6.33k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £591.72k £484.50k £506.25k N/A £462.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds £113.45k £122.58k £107.65k N/A £45.76k
Expenditure - Governance £27.98k £25.52k £31.19k N/A £18.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £7.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £18.57k