TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNEXION WITH ST JOHN'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH BUCKLEY

Charity number: 257539
Charity reporting is overdue by 1128 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 32 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 397 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 763 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1128 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required