TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNEXION WITH ST JOHN'S UNITED REFORMED CHURCH BUCKLEY

Charity number: 257539
Charity reporting is overdue by 1126 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2016
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0