Accounts and annual returns MERIDEN WAR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 257703
Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 199 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 564 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 564 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 930 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 930 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 December 2019 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 December 2019 764 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required