Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY RIFLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258396
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 06 September 2022 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 30 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window