Financial history ACTON AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 258406
Charity reporting is up to date (164 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £46.73k £7.39k £2.04k £1.66k £26.62k
Total expenditure £29.39k £1.89k £0 £561 £32.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A