Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF DERMATOLOGISTS
Charity number: 258474

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Saul Halpern | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Richard Weller | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victoria Swale | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Fiona Thomson | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jemima Elizabet Mellerio | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Ardern-Jones | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Minal Singh | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mitesh Patel | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Weatherhead | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nabla Mary Mcloone | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shalini Narayan | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Wallace | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Bower | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ajoy Bardhan | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alia Ahmed | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tamara Griffiths | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Natalie Stone | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mabs Chowdhury | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nick Levell | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tom Lucke | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rangarajan Rabindranathnambi | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Ingram | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gabriela Petrof | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Newsham | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.