Financial history WEST INDIA COMMITTEE

Charity number: 258545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £200.57k £490.34k £303.80k £328.08k £228.35k
Total expenditure £197.90k £334.75k £392.72k £228.18k £222.25k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A