THE BURTONS' ST LEONARDS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 258719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £929 £3.34k £3.43k £5.92k £5.69k
Total expenditure £3.14k £7.23k £3.81k £3.13k £5.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A