Financial history THE EVANGELICAL TIMES LIMITED

Charity number: 258927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £180.95k £189.76k £194.53k £179.94k £154.56k
Total expenditure £156.32k £165.37k £184.63k £178.03k £175.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A