THE CAMBRIAN COAST EVANGELICAL TRUST

Charity number: 259100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £34.81k £47.67k £31.36k £60.06k £35.63k
Total expenditure £29.38k £29.59k £43.69k £63.70k £32.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A