Financial history ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS' DEPARTMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 259297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £48.35k £16.20k £34.13k £57.38k £90.53k
Total expenditure £32.36k £24.10k £34.31k £20.08k £24.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A