Trustees ROYAL ARMY CHAPLAINS' DEPARTMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 259297

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David Parker | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Peter Hellier | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Francis | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Barrett | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Canon William Grant Ashton | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Alastair Blakey | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Ret'd Tim Purdon | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
The Rev Dr David Hart | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.