TOWN ESTATE CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 259531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 March 2020 06 June 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2019 07 March 2020 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2017 02 January 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 March 2016 22 February 2017 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 March 2016 Not Required