Financial history THE FELTMAKERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 259906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £62.05k £139.96k £57.09k £46.24k £46.20k
Total expenditure £40.29k £48.12k £50.07k £69.41k £44.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A