Trustees THE FELTMAKERS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 259906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER SIMEONS Chair 25 October 2016
None on record
TIMOTHY EDWARD STOCKS Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
JAMES EDWARD DE BROE-FERGUSON Trustee 01 October 2018
HARROW ASSOCIATION SPECIAL PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
ANNE MANNIX Trustee 09 January 2018
None on record
NIGEL MACDONALD Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
ANTHONY PHILLIPS Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
JOHN STEWART RAY Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record