Financial history THE AGATHA CHRISTIE TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 260295
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £1.38k £71.38k £51.66k £51.81k £51.58k
Total expenditure £115.51k £77.74k £54.96k £80.54k £56.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A